DEVONSHIRE PARK PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 508008
Charity reporting is overdue by 647 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise funds in support of pupils at Devonshire Park Primary School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 September 2021

Total income: £1,295
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 October 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DEVONSHIRE PARK HOME AND SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS JILL BILLINGE Trustee
None on record
LORNA GIDDINS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/09/2004 29/09/2019 29/09/2020 29/09/2021
Total gross income £3.82k £0 £0 £1.30k
Total expenditure £1.32k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 281 days
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 281 days
Annual return 29 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 647 days
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 647 days
Annual return 29 September 2021 20 March 2023 234 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 September 2020 20 March 2023 599 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 29 September 2019 20 March 2023 964 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Devonshire Park Primary School
51 Temple Road
Birkenhead
CH42 9JX
Phone:
01513469093