BRITISH DRAGONFLY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE STUDY AND CONSERVATION OF ODONATA AND THEIR NATURAL HABITATS, ESPECIALLY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND TO RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF DRAGONFLIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,935 from 1 government contract(s) and £8,098 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 July 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Martin Coleshaw | Chair | 14 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maria Giulia Checchi | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Timothy Greene | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Cecilia Cavanagh | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Willet | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Digruber | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carmel Edwards | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Joshua Darius Gresham Younespour | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Ann Cooksey | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Peter Brown | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAMELA TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.96k | £74.25k | £162.84k | £164.65k | £394.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.80k | £122.05k | £146.97k | £167.87k | £184.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.93k | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.50k | £8.13k | £5.11k | £5.83k | £8.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 June 2021 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 June 2021 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 19 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE STUDY AND CONSERVATION OF ODONATA AND THEIR NATURAL HABITATS, ESPECIALLY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM; AND (2) TO RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF DRAGONFLIES AND DAMSELFLIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashcroft
Brington Road
Old Weston
HUNTINGDON
PE28 5LP
- Phone:
- 07818 113898
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window