THE KENNINGTON VILLAGE CHARITY

Charity Number: 1166896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity's main aim is to hold an annual event in order to raise funds to support locally based community groups or similar bodies, including other charities who are typically based in the Kennington and Lambeth areas of London. The Charity has to date fulfilled this aim by holding an annual Fete in Cleaver Square, London SE11.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 May 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KIMBRA LEANNE STANDISH Trustee 15 June 2014
None on record
GARETH JONES Trustee 15 June 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.00k £550 £367 £0 £0
Total expenditure £4.55k £1.45k £1.00k £1.50k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 January 2025 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 April 2023 179 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 January 2022 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Hereward Place
STAMFORD
PE9 2JA
Phone:
07715832967
Website:

No information available