CHURCHES TOGETHER IN HOUGHTON REGIS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a simple means for the churches in Houghton Regis to work together, demonstrating our essential unity, in bringing God's love and message to our neighbours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 29 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN HOUGHTON REGIS AND ITS IMMEDIATE SURROUNDINGS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH PRAYER EVENTS, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING MESSAGES OR LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. (2) TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELLBEING OF THE PEOPLE WHO LIVE IN, WORK IN OR VISIT HOUGHTON REGIS AND ITS IMMEDIATE SURROUNDINGS, INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY BUILDING BETTER RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN CHURCHES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN HOUGHTON REGIS AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE AND SUPPORT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window