YEOVIL COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the Christian Faith principally in the Yeovil area, and other areas as deemed appropriate. Activities include troubled family support ( "Yeovil4Families"), Youth activities inside and outside schools, supporting "Yeovil Street Pastors" , "The Lords Larder" (aka Yeovil Food Bank). A Coffee Shop is operated on site, and funds are raised to support christian projects in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,114,024
Donations and legacies | £290.48k | |
Charitable activities | £822.40k | |
Other trading activities | £879 | |
Investments | £262 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,183,111
Raising funds | £624 | |
Charitable activities | £1.18m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £624 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.18m |
People

39 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert David Brazier | Chair | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL HARDY | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Helen Day | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Bastable | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Hoyles | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Jonathan Peter Collins | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Keith Gordon Foy | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM JOHN MILLER NICHOLS | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAREN HIBBERT | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £550.79k | £916.87k | £1.11m | £1.08m | £1.11m | |
|
Total expenditure | £577.39k | £644.46k | £904.06k | £1.10m | £1.18m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £16.35k | £573.20k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £66.00k | £322.87k | £26.87k | £2.67k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £234.98k | £795.40k | £251.88k | £265.22k | £290.48k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £84.61k | £37.27k | £0 | £10.78k | £879 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £231.21k | £84.12k | £829.13k | £797.98k | £822.40k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £251.88k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £82 | £20 | £411 | £262 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.67k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £505 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £577.39k | £644.46k | £904.06k | £1.09m | £1.18m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £12.09k | £624 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.00k | £2.25k | £13.02k | £12.93k | £15.31k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £897.77k | £918.15k | £929.07k | £977.64k | £963.38k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £119.64k | £368.87k | £593.29k | £535.66k | £478.86k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £27.74k | £24.94k | £56.44k | £71.30k | £69.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF YEOVIL COMMUNITY CHURCH IN ITS VARIOUS FACETS BOTH IN AND AROUND THE AREA OF YEOVIL, SOMERSET AND SUCH OTHER AREAS AS MAY BE DEEMED APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME INCLUDING OVERSEAS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD. 3) TO ADVANCE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BOTH TO ADULTS AND CHILDREN IRRESPECTIVE OF RACE, SEX, CREED OR COLOUR. 4) TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN MAINTAINING THE UP-KEEP AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF ANY BUILDINGS UTILISED BY OR IN CONJUNCTION WITH YEOVIL COMMUNITY CHURCH AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES IN ANY SUCH BUILDING OR BUILDINGS. 5) CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS FOR THE TOWN OF YEOVIL, SOMERSET OR FOR SUCH OTHER AREAS IN WHICH YEOVIL COMMUNITY CHURCH MAY WORK FROM TIME TO TIME AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yeovil Community Church
The Gateway
Addlewell Lane
Yeovil
BA20 1QN
- Phone:
- 01935433146
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window