Financial history Lune Valley Beekeepers

Charity number: 1167725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £6.43k £15.33k £12.59k £10.09k £9.89k
Total expenditure £5.49k £13.51k £5.82k £10.42k £8.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A