Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF LLANIDLOES COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1167080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 July 2024 12 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 15 July 2023 04 July 2024 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 15 July 2022 20 May 2023 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 15 July 2021 18 May 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 15 July 2020 10 June 2021 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2020 Not Required