Financial history FRIENDS OF LLANIDLOES COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1167080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/07/2020 15/07/2021 15/07/2022 15/07/2023 15/07/2024
Total gross income £5.96k £1.13k £1.66k £7.59k £12.18k
Total expenditure £8.39k £3.14k £1.97k £3.81k £8.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A