FRIENDS OF LLANIDLOES COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends shall advance the education of the pupils of Llanidloes Community Primary School by providing and assisting in the provision of opportunities and additional resources (not normally provided by the local education authority), to enrich and enhance the learning experience of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Powys
Governance
- 13 May 2016: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF LLANIDLOES C P SCHOOL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Nia Plumridge | Chair | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Catherine Rees | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Mair Jones | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Rose Robillard | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Sian Hawkins | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/07/2019 | 15/07/2020 | 15/07/2021 | 15/07/2022 | 15/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.50k | £5.96k | £1.13k | £1.66k | £7.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.31k | £8.39k | £3.14k | £1.97k | £3.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 July 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 July 2022 | 20 May 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 July 2020 | 10 June 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 July 2019 | 08 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 JUL 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE FRIENDS SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF LLANIDLOES COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES AND ADDITIONAL RESOURCES (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY), TO ENRICH AND ENHANCE THE LEARNING EXPERIENCE OF THE PUPILS. IN ADDITION, THERE WILL BE AN EMPHASIS ON BUILDING RELATIONSHIPS WITH THE STAFF, THE PARENTS, THE PUPILS, AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY WITH SUSTAINABILITY IN MIND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Llanidloes Cp School
Llangurig Road
LLANIDLOES
Powys
SY18 6EX
- Phone:
- 01686414605
- Email:
- nicola.macken@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window