Financial history HOSPITAL ROOMS

Charity Number: 1168101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £488.14k £666.58k £768.80k £950.53k £1.32m
Total expenditure £438.64k £375.06k £804.34k £878.42k £1.27m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £254.84k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £40.37k £9.68k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £192.89k £430.63k £203.75k £124.55k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £194.72k £159.88k £289.75k £439.51k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £66.25k £178.29k £457.03k £746.94k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £5.90k
Income - Other N/A £212.72k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £296.40k £743.28k £749.56k £1.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £78.66k £61.06k £128.86k £185.96k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £900 £1.00k £30.98k £48.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0