THE WALK OF LIFE (WEST MIDLANDS)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty Advancement of citizenship Advancement of education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sandwell
Governance
- 10 May 2016: CIO registration
- THE WALK OF LIFE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Justyna Szczepanska | Trustee | 16 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danuta Przybylska | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
BEATA STOJEK | Trustee | 22 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £264 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £70 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 May 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG POLISH ROMA MIGRANT WORKERS AND THEIR DEPENDENTS LIVING IN SANDWELL BY PROVIDING FREE ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE WHICH WILL INCLUDE BUT NOT BE LIMITED TO INTERPRETING/TRANSLATING SERVICES, HEALTH AND HOUSING ADVICE, PROVISION OF FURNITURE, HOUSEHOLD ITEMS AND CLOTHING FOR PEOPLE WHO FOR REASONS OR POVERTY WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH HELP. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF POLISH ROMA MIGRANT WORKERS AND THEIR DEPENDENTS LIVING IN SANDWELL BY PROVIDING PRINCIPALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, ENGLISH LANGUAGE TEACHING, IT CLASSES, COOKERY SKILLS AND OTHER FORMS OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ROMA WORKERS IN THE SUBJECTS OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO ATTEND COURSES AND ADVICE ON THE LIFE IN THE UK TEST; AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE WHO DO NOT SPEAK ENGLISH AS A FIRST LANGUAGE; ROMA WORKERS. 3. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF POLISH ROMA MIGRANT WORKERS AND THEIR DEPENDENTS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR STATUS AND THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PEOPLE IN NEED THEREOF AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Walk of Life (West Midlands)
Unit 1D
Global Centre
312-314 High Street
West Bromwich
B70 8EN
- Phone:
- 07825449241
- Email:
- walkoflife.wm@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window