VILLAGE HALL (ILLSTON-ON-THE-HILL)

Charity Number: 508023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

vILLAGE HALL PROVIDING SERVICES TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,788
Total expenditure: £5,123

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 April 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ILLSTON ON THE HILL VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Timothy Bullough Chair 17 February 2015
None on record
Karen Joyce Bullough Trustee 17 February 2015
None on record
PAT LAUDER Trustee 17 March 2013
None on record
Ian Lauder Professor Trustee 17 March 2013
INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL PATHOLOGY
Received: On time
THE HOPE FOUNDATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH
Received: On time
ILLSTON TOWN LAND CHARITY
Received: On time
Mavis Green Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.03k £11.62k £2.47k £3.01k £3.79k
Total expenditure £8.79k £3.93k £3.72k £3.80k £5.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 November 2022 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PADDOCK HOUSE
MAIN STREET
ILLSTON
LEICESTER
LE7 9EG
Phone:
01162596511