THE GATEACRE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A local amenity and civic society aiming to improve and protect the local environment and architectural heritage of the Gateacre area of Liverpool
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 19 October 1978: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr BRIAN GEORGE SPENCER DOMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN PHYTHIAN FBENG | Trustee | 25 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA SANDLAND | Trustee | 08 July 2013 |
|
|||||
PAM BALL | Trustee |
|
||||||
ERYL LLOYD CHITTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSEMARY DOMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £734 | £1.02k | £725 | £1.08k | £473 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.14k | £839 | £1.23k | £980 | £875 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 03 July 2024 | 339 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 05 August 2020 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 APRIL 1978
Charitable objects
(A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY AND OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC AND PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
GATEACRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 CHARTMOUNT WAY
LIVERPOOL
L25 5LB
- Phone:
- 01514287801
- Email:
- mail@gatsoc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window