LINBEE DOG REHOMING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We rescue predominantly, but not exclusively, pound dogs at high risk of euthanasia. We rescue abandoned dogs. We provide assessment, training and rehabilitation, where necessary, prior to rehoming. We provide ongoing support for the dogs we rehome. We operate a non destruct policy unless advised by a veterinary surgeon on welfare grounds to do so.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Doncaster
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 15 June 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamie Booth | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Pennell | Trustee | 31 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mary Whitaker | Trustee | 14 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.00k | £71.69k | £73.42k | £52.58k | £62.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.01k | £54.61k | £57.64k | £57.60k | £62.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS IN PARTICULAR HIGH RISK POUND DOGS, IN THE UK - SPECIFICALLY WEST YORKSHIRE. TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN KENNELS FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF THESE UNWANTED DOGS AND TO FINANCE THEIR NECESSARY UPKEEP AND VETERINARY COSTS PRIOR TO THEM BEING RE-HOMED IF AND WHEN POSSIBLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lowgate Crossing Farm Kennels
Lowgate
Balne
GOOLE
DN14 0ED
- Phone:
- 07800504262
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window