Totnes Community Tennis Club

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community tennis club, promoting playing tennis
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 09 September 2016: CIO registration
- TOTNES TENNIS CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jack Clancy | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Clayton | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary O'Leary | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry Barbour | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Edwards | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Loader Chair | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.53k | £33.99k | £48.84k | £43.95k | £43.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.02k | £7.63k | £23.04k | £20.58k | £16.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £41.50k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Sep 2016 as amended on 16 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF TOTNES TENNIS CLUB IS TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING TENNIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Totnes Tennis Club
Borough Park Road
TOTNES
Devon
TQ9 5XW
- Phone:
- 07766082685
- Email:
- info@totnestennis.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window