Financial history GAYTON PRIMARY PTA

Charity number: 1168184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £14.32k £13.96k £15.28k £15.98k £15.82k
Total expenditure £10.25k £19.66k £9.80k £23.10k £14.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A