Financial history HAZRATH SHAHJALAL JAMIE MASJID

Charity Number: 1171119
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £28.73k £15.71k £57.94k £57.00k £99.87k
Total expenditure £400 £4.68k £5.72k £5.70k £45.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A