HAZRATH SHAHJALAL JAMIE MASJID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE A CHARITY WHERE WE RUN 5 DAILY PRAYERS, TALKS AND HELP THE ELDERLY IN THE COMMUNITY, ORGANISE PUBLIC GET TOGETHER DAY TRIPS, WE ARE ALSO TRYING TO HAVE COMPUTER CLASSES AND HELP LADIES WITH ESOL AND BACK TO WORK, WE OPERATE IN 95 MANOR ROAD, BLETCHLEY, MILTON KEYNES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 13 January 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUJIBUR RAHMAN | Chair | 18 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHAHJAHAN ALI | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL KALAM AZAD | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
mohammed shoriff ali | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Faiyaz Mohammed UDDIN | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL GOUS | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SONOUR ALI | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.73k | £15.71k | £57.94k | £57.00k | £99.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £400 | £4.68k | £5.72k | £5.70k | £45.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 29 April 2025 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 29 April 2025 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 13 June 2024 | 133 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 25 July 2021 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 25 July 2021 | 174 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 13 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENANTS AND DOCTRINE OF THE SUNNI HANAFI SECT OF ISLAM (SUNNI SUFI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT) IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF THE PLACE OF WORSHIP AND FACILITIES FOR THE OTHER FUNCTIONS OF RELIGIOUS CHARACTER SUCH AS THE CELEBRATION OF RECITAL, CEREMONIES AND FESTIVALS AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THE AFORESAID OBJECTS. B) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
HSJM
95 Manor Road
Bletchley
MILTON KEYNES
MK2 2GT
- Phone:
- 07986240934
- Email:
- faroquemk@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
hsjm.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window