E P COLLIER SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The school undertakes general fundraising activities so that it can provide extra equipment and services for the education of the pupils of EP Collier Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Reading
Governance
- 11 May 2016: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandie Gill | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD STAINTHORP | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Rachel Pulleyn | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
JUSTINE MCMINN | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.74k | £3.59k | £1.85k | £2.15k | £8.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.57k | £1.43k | £650 | £88 | £825 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 October 2020 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 SEP 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT E P COLLIER PRIMARY SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPLYING GOODS AND SERVICES FOR THEIR BENEFIT NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. FUNDS WILL NOT BE USED FOR STAFF BENEFITS NOR TO PAY EMPLOYEES OR GOVERNORS EXCEPT FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF FUNDS USED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
E P COLLIER SCHOOL
ROSS ROAD
READING
RG1 8DZ
- Phone:
- 01189375470
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window