Financial history FRIENDS OF THURNHAM

Charity number: 1168528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £13.95k £6.58k £14.75k £21.03k £15.14k
Total expenditure £5.93k £9.54k £11.90k £18.98k £20.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.00k N/A