HUMANITY HOMES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of accommodation and accommodation based services to homeless or insecurely housed people in the UK. Provision of information, advice and training for the benefit of homeless or insecurely housed people in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 June 2016: Standard registration
- 04 March 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2017 | 27 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2017 | 27 March 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF HOMELESSNESS AND HOUSING NEED AMONGST THOSE IN POVERTY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION AND ACCOMMODATION BASED SERVICES TO PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL HOUSING AND RAISING AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF OUR BENEFICIARIES; 2. THE RELIEF OF HOMELESSNESS AND HOUSING NEED AMONGST THOSE IN POVERTY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND TRAINING TO PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window