AL-TAWHEED ORPHAN CHARITY

Charity Number: 1168200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The prevention of poverty and relief of financial hardship of orphans in somalia/somaliland by making grants of money or paying for items, services or facilities. To advance the education of orphans attending markaz al-tawheed in burao, somaliland by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for education at the school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £15,008
Total expenditure: £17,519

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Somalia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 July 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
AMINA DERIA Trustee 10 April 2016
None on record
MANA ABDULLAHI Trustee 16 February 2016
None on record
HANAN MAH Trustee 06 February 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £14.88k £23.33k £21.15k £23.93k £15.01k
Total expenditure £14.09k £16.57k £21.25k £28.76k £17.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 29 March 2024 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 01 April 2023 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 27 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 12 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
198 WENSLEY STREET
SHEFFIELD
S4 8HN
Phone:
01144382366