DULWICH INTERNATIONAL SCHOOLS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to seed, mentor and activate organisations engaged in growing and strengthening the movement for educational and vocational equity and excellence. DISF is a philanthropic Catalyst for Social Change. We strive actively to support organisations and social enterprises that are engaged in guiding child and young adults to move from poverty into into prosperity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Burma
Governance
- 04 May 2016: CIO registration
- DISF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IVAN CLIVE LEVY | Chair | 04 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JOHN MCDOUALL | Trustee | 04 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ole Bettum | Trustee | 04 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £216.50k | £138.07k | £152.49k | £183.16k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.82k | £131.36k | £99.24k | £112.63k | £4.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 572 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 572 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 04 May 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE FOUNDATION IS TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RELIEVING POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ivan Levy
Waldheim 3
6062 Wilen
- Phone:
- 0041797529958
- Email:
- info@disf.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window