Financial history THE SHIPPEY CAMPAIGN

Charity Number: 1166989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £50 £0 £0 £5.00k £1.51k
Total expenditure £959 £0 £231 £623 £1.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A