CLASS 45/1 PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Currently, the locomotive (45133) is at it's home base at the Midland Railway, Butterley. The locomotive is undergoing a major overhaul that commenced in November 2017. For up to date information about progress, please visit our website (www.45133.co.uk).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 July 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER DENNIS | Chair | 22 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Dexter | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
JASON WADE | Trustee | 22 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE WADE | Trustee | 22 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.16k | £27.56k | £28.68k | £20.54k | £9.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.95k | £61.62k | £100.56k | £45.28k | £6.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 19 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND PARTICULARLY ENGINEERING LEARNING AND SKILLS DEVELOPMENT BY THE ACQUISITION, RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, EXHIBITION AND OPERATION OF A BRITISH RAILWAYS CLASS 45/1 DIESEL LOCOMOTIVE, ROLLING STOCK, EQUIPMENT AND ARTEFACTS, RELICS, ROAD VEHICLES, DOCUMENTS AND RECORDS OF HISTORIC AND ENGINEERING INTEREST AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 ROUNDHILL LINK
YORK
YO30 4UN
- Phone:
- 01904693159
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window