Financial history UNITY WELFARE EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1168408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £17.11k £29.24k £42.04k £42.91k £50.17k
Total expenditure £2.60k £3.13k £2.55k £3.90k £7.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A