FLITCH GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Management and Maintenance of the Community Hall, Football Pitches and associated play areas for the benefit of the Flitch Green Community on a voluntary not for profit basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 18 May 2016: CIO registration
- FLITCH GREEN CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Craig Mitchinson | Chair | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mitchell Carter | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Louise Ingram | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Brazier | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lilly Criscione | Trustee | 31 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christian Augusto Criscione | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN WILLIAM CRAWFORD | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE EMMA NICHOLLS | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALICE NORRIS | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HORN | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.08k | £47.02k | £64.36k | £61.52k | £51.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.52k | £32.59k | £53.03k | £61.24k | £70.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.15k | £9.96k | £4.03k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 May 2016
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND ASSOCIATED SPORTS FACILITIES AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF FLITCH GREEN ("AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flitch Green Community Centre
Tanton Road
Flitch Green
DUNMOW
Essex
CM6 3GG
- Phone:
- 01371821141
- Email:
- steve.crawfordhome@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window