Financial history FRIENDS OF GUR FOUNDATION ISRAEL

Charity number: 1168057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £1.57m £1.28m £746.05k £913.44k £357.12k
Total expenditure £1.68m £1.19m £812.62k £932.36k £405.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.57m £1.28m £746.05k £913.44k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £356 £6 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.67m £1.19m £809.65k £927.36k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.80k £809 £2.97k £5.01k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £11.47k £8.27k £2.99k £2.99k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.65m £1.17m £804.08k £920.00k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A