Financial history SEATON GATEWAY THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1167779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £191.86k £58.00k £145.42k £177.51k £215.74k
Total expenditure £170.71k £84.00k £126.22k £192.10k £220.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £41.00k £80.30k £3.67k £5.31k