OFF THE RECORD

Charity number: 508061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Free confidential counselling service for young people between the ages of 10-28.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £188,535
Total expenditure: £237,390

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Oldham
  • Tameside

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 October 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Hansford Chair 25 April 2017
None on record
Judith Mary Foxton Trustee 19 November 2019
None on record
Paul Alan Quinn Trustee 31 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £356.61k £342.79k £307.91k £170.50k £188.54k
Total expenditure £325.73k £301.96k £474.27k £265.43k £237.39k
Income from government contracts £91.50k £91.50k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £109.40k £3.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 February 2024 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 February 2024 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Off The Record - Unit 26
Tanner Bros (Greenfield) Ltd
Waterside Mill
Chew Valley Road
Greenfield
OLDHAM
Phone:
07917042930