THE ULYSSES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising in order to provide financial support to Adventurous Training and challenging activities by members of UK's Military Reserve and Cadet Forces.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 June 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colonel Mark Siebenaller TD VR | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Honor Wilson-Fletcher | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Air Commodore Dawn McCafferty | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Tim Seal TD DL VR | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|||||
JAMES RICHARD SWINBURN WILSON | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
LT COLONEL PHILIP NEAME MBE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE ANNE FERNANDES | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
ROD STABLES | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £275.00k | £171.98k | £171.98k | £408.92k | £482.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £336.00k | £124.73k | £124.73k | £356.00k | £397.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 07 DEC 2016 AMENDED ON 15 OCT 2024
Charitable objects
FURTHERING THE EFFICIENCY OF THE VOLUNTEER RESERVE FORCES AND THE EDUCATION OF THEIR PERSONNEL; PROMOTING INTEREST AND MORALE IN THE VOLUNTEER RESERVE FORCES AND RECRUITMENT TO THEM; AND PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE CADET FORCES AND ENABLING IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, SUCH PERSONS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES THAT THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED; BY UNDERTAKING EXPEDITIONS FOR THE PURPOSE OF CARRYING OUT RESEARCH IN GEOLOGY GEOPHYSICS GLACIOLOGY METEOROLOGY PHYSIOLOGY ORNITHOLOGY BOTANY NATURAL HISTORY AND KINDRED SCIENCES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES THAT FURTHER THE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE. SUCH EXPEDITIONS MAY INCLUDE INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE NOT THEMSELVES MEMBERS OF THE VOLUNTEER RESERVE FORCES BUT WHOSE PRESENCE NONETHELESS PROMOTES THE OBJECTS. IN THIS CLAUSE: "VOLUNTEER RESERVE FORCES" SHALL MEAN AUXILIARIES AND RESERVISTS OF HIS MAJESTY'S FORCES; AND “CADET FORCES” SHALL MEAN ANY MEMBER OF A CADET UNIT THAT IS SPONSORED BY THE MOD (ARMY CADET FORCE, SEA CADET CORPS, MOD SPONSORED SEA SCOUTS, RAF AIR CADETS, AIR TRAINING CORPS, RM VOLUNTEER CADET CORPS, RN VOLUNTEER CADET CORPS, COMBINED CADET FORCE, AS WELL AS ADULT VOLUNTEERS WITH THE CADET FORCES AND THE CADET EXPANSION PROGRAMME), OR A MEMBER OF A YOUTH ORGANISATION THAT WORKS UNDER A MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING WITH THE MOD
Linked charities
- 30 June 1992 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
David Evans &Co Ltd
Stowegate House
Lombard Street
Lichfield
Staffordshire
WS13 6DP
- Phone:
- 07415 702685
- Email:
- honsec@ulyssestrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window