CHALFONTS U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancementof education, and in particular the education of older people and those who are retired from full time work, by all means including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development, in Chalfont ST Peter and its surroundings locally
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 08 August 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Hirszowicz | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Cameron | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Val Smith | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Les Klein | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David J Powell | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Krushner | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary Hillis | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Green | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Hardwick | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Clegg | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth White | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.93k | £20.14k | £5.63k | £22.10k | £26.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.10k | £8.92k | £17.44k | £16.93k | £22.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 FEB 2015 as amended on 24 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE NOT IN FULLTIME EMPLOYMENT WHO ARE IN THEIR THIRD AGE (BEING THE PERIOD OF TIME AFTER THE FIRST AGE OF CHILDHOOD DEPENDENCE AND THE SECOND AGE OF FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT AND/OR PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY) RESIDING IN CHALFONT ST PETER AND CHALFONTS AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chalfont St. Peter Community Centre
Gravel Hill
Chalfont St. Peter
GERRARDS CROSS
Buckinghamshire
SL9 9QX
- Phone:
- 01753885726
- Website:
-
ChalfontsU3A
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window