GIVE EDUCATION TO ALL (GETA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GETA (Give Education to All) funds the educational initiatives promoted by Fr Paul Bigirwa in the Republic of Uganda, These initiatives focus primarily on sponsoring the education of post-16 year old students, especially females wishing to continue their education beyond the statutory requirement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Uganda
Governance
- 16 May 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Rose | Chair | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Francis Parkes | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dorothea Rose | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.52k | £3.80k | £2.91k | £8.41k | £5.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.00k | £5.50k | £1.72k | £6.21k | £123 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 JUN 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF ORPHANED AND UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN (PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) AT ST THERESA NURSERY AND PRIMARY SCHOOL, IGAYAZA-KIBAALE DISTRICT, HOIMA, UGANDA BY PROVIDING FUNDS TO: A) HELP THE CONSTRUCTION OF SCHOOL BUILDINGS B) FURNISH AND EQUIP CLASSROOMS C) PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES AND OTHER COSTS IN THE CASE OF INDIVIDUAL PUPILS IN NEED, AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF NURSERY AND PRIMARY SCHOOL CHILDREN IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF WESTMINSTER AND SOUTHWARK BY DEVELOPING EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL LINKS (PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) WITH ST THERESA NURSERY AND PRIMARY SCHOOL, IGAYAZA-KIBAALE DISTRICT, HOIMA, UGANDA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 COURT WAY
TWICKENHAM
TW2 7SA
- Phone:
- 07940356622
- Email:
- info@geta.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window