THE VALERIA SYKES CHARITABLE FOUNDATION CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants and awards to advance education in the arts and to advance the development of skills, capacities and capabilities of young people in Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 May 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VALERIA SYKES | Chair | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SYKES | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER FOSKETT | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.83k | £35.82k | £37.23k | £37.33k | £36.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.88k | £74.47k | £155.76k | £56.36k | £73.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 May 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME BY MAKING GRANTS AND AWARDS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: - THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN THE ARTS; AND - THE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE BY THE DEVELOPMENT OF SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Sheriff Lane
BINGLEY
West Yorkshire
BD16 3EN
- Phone:
- +447715608751
- Email:
- peter.w.foskett@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window