THE MEDBURN TRUST

Charity number: 1168503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's objects are such general charitable purposes or objects (according to the law of England and Wales) as the trustees shall determine from time to time. This is achieved by making grants for educational and religious promotion. The grants are made primarily to other charities registered in the United Kingdom.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £31,250
Total expenditure: £22,567

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STANLEY HAROLD DAVIS Trustee 12 January 2016
SINAI JEWISH PRIMARY SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST
Recently registered
OPHIR LETHBRIDGE Trustee 12 January 2016
None on record
RACHEL RITA DAVIS Trustee 12 January 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £0 £62.50k £0 £31.25k £31.25k
Total expenditure £76.05k £77.85k £51.13k £58.87k £22.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 26 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 19 April 2024 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 19 April 2024 141 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 29 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 26 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Apartment 6
Medburn House
Mill Hill Place
London
Phone:
02075542222
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available