ADA PARKER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Further training for doctors and nurses in designated area through funding
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Coventry City
Governance
- 24 October 1978: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr LIONEL JAMES BOOTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £236 | £181 | £130 | £129 | £130 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1297 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1297 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1662 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1662 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 19 APRIL, 1978.
Charitable objects
CLEAR INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN EQUIPPING OR FURNISHING REST ROOMS ON RECREATION ROOMS FOR THE MEDICAL AND NURSING STAFF OF THE HOSPITALS FORMERLY ADMINISTERED BY THE COVENTRY HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE OR IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE SAID STAFF IN THE PERFORMANCE OF THEIR DUTIES.
Area of benefit
COVENTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 CARLTON GARDENS
WARWICK AVENUE
COVENTRY
CV5 6DH
- Phone:
- 02476673416
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window