FAITH CHAPEL MINISTRIES OF THE PENTECOSTAL ASSEMBLIES OF THE WORLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective and principal activity is to promote the advancement of the Christian religion, in accordance with the articles of faith contained in the Charity's constitution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 October 2016: CIO registration
- FAITH CHAPEL CHURCH (Working name)
- FAITH CHAPEL MINISTRIES (Working name)
- Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev LLOYD GEORGE THOMAS | Chair | 16 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Michael Haughton | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Myrtle Pinnock | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fitzgerald Wheatle | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melissa St Fort | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Anderson | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie John | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Mireku | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH PITT | Trustee | 16 February 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.62k | £359.72k | £318.32k | £274.14k | £143.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.37k | £75.65k | £81.08k | £104.14k | £134.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Oct 2016 as amended on 14 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH CHURCHES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ARTICLES OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO; 2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CIO MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT INCLUDING BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS; AND 3 TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP AS A RESULT OF THEIR AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES INCLUDING THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AWARENESS
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAITH CHAPEL
198 BELLENDEN ROAD
LONDON
SE15 4BW
- Phone:
- 02076358155
- Email:
- faithchapeluk@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window