VILLAGE LIFE COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Life has been established as a charity to help save life in rural communities in Llangattock Vibon Avel, a community council area in Monmouthshire. The charity has installed five publicly accessible defibrillators at suitable locations, is training local people in lifesaving resuscitation skills, and developing 'help in a crisis' good neighbour volunteer schemes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 06 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Alexander Loughlin | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Darren Lee Rockach | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Johnson | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julia Ann Willis | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Carol Green | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
TOM PITTS-TUCKER | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
FIVE PETER STANWAY CRAM | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.30k | £1.30k | £415 | £886 | £2.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £590 | £1.32k | £878 | £1.18k | £479 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £250 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Oct 2016 as amended on 01 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
OBJECTS THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO: (A) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HUMAN LIFE BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A COMMUNITY BASED EMERGENCY RESPONSE ORGANISATION, BASED AROUND PUBLICLY ACCESSIBLE AEDS WITH VOLUNTEERS TRAINED IN CPR AND THE USE OF AEDS. (B) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ty Uchaf
St. Maughans
MONMOUTH
NP25 5QF
- Phone:
- 01600228957
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window