BODMIN AND DISTRICT WOODTURNERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Propagation of the art and skill of woodturning in the district of Bodmin, North Cornwall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 06 June 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Dart | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alan Jevons | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Herbert Bevan | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Victor March | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dermot Charles Elsey | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Long | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CHARLES MANSFIELD | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Batho | Trustee | 08 December 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.63k | £6.15k | £3.14k | £3.87k | £5.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.19k | £5.55k | £3.05k | £3.13k | £4.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 06 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE CRAFT OF WOODTURNING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN DOING SO RAISE APPRECIATION OF THE CREATIVITY, SKILL AND HERITAGE OF WOODTURNING. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CRAFT AND SKILL OF WOODTURNING
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Grenville Meadows
Lostwithiel
PL22 0JS
- Phone:
- 01208872012
- Email:
- bdwtmembership@gmail.com
- Website:
-
bdwt.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window