UNITED COMMUNITY AND HOPE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the charity is currently operating in Manchester where we are continuing to provide worship service every Sunday morning at 1 Beckford street, at Oldham road. The task involves preaching the Gospel , organising community and event, advising and educating members of the community morally and spiritually.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 January 2017: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul NGUIYA | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
KIKAYI WA KIKAYI | Trustee | 16 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
LAURE TCHADO | Trustee | 31 December 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.58k | £3.65k | £3.13k | £9.25k | £6.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.36k | £8.49k | £11.04k | £11.14k | £5.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED ON 11 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE, FOR PUBLIC BENEFITS: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF ITS MEMBERS AND THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETING, WORSHIP, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS PRODUCING AND/ OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THIS CONSTITUTION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 3.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. 3.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHURCH IN PROMOTING ITS OBJECTIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Tamerton Drive
MANCHESTER
M8 0DH
- Phone:
- 07538202058
- Email:
- info@uchc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window