MILTON ABBEY HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance of historic abbey and chapel Creation of visitor facilities for abbey and surrounding historic landscape Interpretation of historic Benedictine spirituality into 21st century setting
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 29 July 2016: Standard registration
- 06 November 2023: Funds received from 1188581 THE BENEDICTINE COMPANIONS OF THE ABBEY AT MILTON
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Very Rev Stephen John Waine | Chair | 02 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Anne Litchfield | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Neil Croucher | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Helier Exon | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Lewis Pearson | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
THE VEN ANTONY CHARLES MACROW-WOOD | Trustee | 16 December 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.26k | £4.92k | £12.61k | £4.33k | £5.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.41k | £2.12k | £21.61k | £5.57k | £3.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 DEC 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYÆS OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE: (A) TO MAINTAIN AND ENHANCE THE FABRIC OF THE BENEDICTINE ABBEY OF ST. SAMPSON, THE ASSOCIATED CHAPEL ST. CATHERINE AND SURROUNDING CAPABILITY BROWN LANDSCAPE SITUATED IN MILTON ABBAS, DORSET AS BUILDINGS AND LAND OF HISTORICAL AND ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON MATTERS CONNECTED WITH THE ABBEY, CHAPEL AND LANDSCAPE AS BUILDINGS AND LAND OF HISTORICAL AND ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; AND (C) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Emmaus House
The Avenue
Wilton
SALISBURY
SP2 0FG
- Phone:
- 01722411922
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window