THE HARGREAVES LANSDOWN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1167927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We utilise the skills and time of our workforce and partners to make a positive, sustainable difference in the world around us.We focus on four pillars: The next generation, local communities, health & wellbeing, and improving lives. We select charities corresponding to these pillars which we support through a range of fundraising events. The charities are nominated and selected by employees.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £187,953
Total expenditure: £266,156

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 June 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE HL FOUNDATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sophie Cole Chair 10 March 2023
None on record
Craig Lee Blackmore Trustee 04 June 2024
None on record
Adam Fairhead Trustee 05 March 2024
GORDON MOODY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE 1930 FUND FOR DISTRICT NURSES (NO 1)
Received: On time
Maura Brady Trustee 05 March 2024
THE ABBEYFIELD BERKHAMSTED AND HEMEL HEMPSTEAD SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
CHILTERN WELCOMES
Received: On time
Sophie Mitchell Trustee 12 December 2023
None on record
Rachel Louise Gill Trustee 10 March 2023
None on record
Katie Hooper Trustee 10 March 2023
None on record
Anna Mary Louden Trustee 10 March 2023
None on record
Amy Stirling Trustee 10 March 2023
None on record
TIMOTHY MONELLE Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2019 01/09/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £128.14k £234.76k £221.42k £202.52k £187.95k
Total expenditure £118.79k £172.31k £124.81k £200.05k £266.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 September 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 29 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 September 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Anchor Road
Bristol
BS1 5HL
Phone:
01173141754
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available