REFRESH TUNBRIDGE WELLS

Charity number: 1167806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotional, lobbying and fundraising activities to advance art for the public benefit by the provision, refurbishment and maintenance of publicly available works of art in Tunbridge Wells

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £1,303
Total expenditure: £1,212

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 June 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor MICHAEL JOHN, DE KOBY HOLMAN Chair 02 June 2016
None on record
ADRIAN CHRISTOPHER BERENDT Trustee 31 March 2022
THE ROBERT ANDERSON RESEARCH CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Michael McGeary Trustee 06 November 2018
None on record
ROBERT CHARLES ATWOOD FCA Trustee 02 June 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £502 £1.30k
Total expenditure £60 £78 £88 £67 £1.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 04 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 04 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 23 May 2024 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 23 May 2024 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 02 May 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 02 May 2023 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 29 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Mayfield Road
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN4 8ES
Phone:
01892523013
Website:

No information available