Trustees CONCERTS AT CRATFIELD CIO
Charity number: 1169617

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Bennett-Hall | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Whitney-Long | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Glenda Bennett | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Hyatt King | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Reeves | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Birt | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Ingham | Trustee | 08 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.