GOD IN REAL LIFE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Based in Newcastle upon Tyne, we primarily create and share videos about the Bible, God and the Christian faith. We want to show how our real lives point to God and use video to help people catch a glimpse of Him. We also create resources to help other people use video to talk about God. We believe that good videos are honest, simple and not necessarily high in budget.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 October 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/10/2017 | 18/10/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.32k | £2.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £654 | £450 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 October 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 18 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 18 October 2018 | 07 January 2020 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2018 | 16 January 2020 | 151 days late | |
Annual return | 18 October 2017 | 15 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 October 2017 | 17 August 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE. - TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT - MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY CREATING AND SHARING CHRISTIAN VIDEOS OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE. - TO HELP OTHER PEOPLE, MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, CHURCH LEADERS AND CHRISTIANS ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY GIVING ADVICE AND TRAINING ON PRODUCING CHRISTIAN VIDEO CONTENT OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window