HHUGS - HELPING HOUSEHOLDS UNDER GREAT STRESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE THE FINANCIAL AND EMOTIONAL HARDSHIP OF MUSLIM DETAINEES/FORMER DETAINEES & FAMILIES HELD IN THE UK AND ABROAD (SO LONG AS FAMILIES ARE RESIDENT/CITIZENS OF THE UK). BY WAY OF PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, EMOTIONAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IF THE NEED ARISES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YASSER KHAN | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|||
Cerie Bullivant | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|||
Shaheer Choudhury | Trustee | 29 March 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 March 2022 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 March 2022 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE EMOTIONAL DISTRESS, AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF INDIVIDUALS, AND THEIR FAMILIES, WHO ARE INVESTIGATED OR DETAINED AS A RESULT OF COUNTER-TERRORISM, NATIONAL SECURITY AND EXTREMISM RELATED LEGISLATION AND POLICIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Somerset Close
NEW MALDEN
KT3 5RF
- Phone:
- 07956486265
- Email:
- info@hhugs.org.uk
- Website:
-
info@hhugs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window