Financial history ENFIELD BRASS BAND

Charity number: 1167281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.16k £4.20k £3.52k £5.09k £5.52k
Total expenditure £6.62k £3.44k £3.88k £3.99k £7.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A