ENFIELD BRASS BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Music & Arts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
- Enfield
- Haringey
- Hertfordshire
- Islington
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 23 May 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY JANE SMITH | Chair | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Long | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAREN SUZANNE BURNELL | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
SYDNEY MCGOWAN | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.16k | £4.20k | £3.52k | £5.09k | £5.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.62k | £3.44k | £3.88k | £3.99k | £7.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JAN 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF MUSIC AND IN PARTICULAR BRASS BAND MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER MUSICAL ACTIVITIES. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE ART OF MUSIC, PARTICULARLY BRASS BAND MUSIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Higham Station Avenue
LONDON
E4 9AY
- Phone:
- 07956177900
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window