FERNBANK NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children's nursery
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £188,761 from 1 government contract(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 08 June 2016: Standard registration
- 07 August 2017: Funds received from 1069793 FERNBANK PRE-SCHOOL
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IMRAN MUNIR | Chair | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222.20k | £196.20k | £202.13k | £215.92k | £223.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.70k | £188.70k | £164.93k | £194.71k | £203.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £181.57k | £177.58k | £175.90k | £189.58k | £188.76k | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.55k | £3.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 JUL 2003
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Contact information
- Address:
-
PIERCE C A LTD
MENTOR HOUSE
AINSWORTH STREET
BLACKBURN
BB1 6AY
- Phone:
- 01254 689899
- Email:
- fernbanknursery@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window