Financial history THE ALTENBURG FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1170216
Charity reporting is up to date (35 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £127.30k £1.28m £64.14k £1.12m £159.98k
Total expenditure £126.91k £82.12k £76.11k £240.40k £274.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.26m N/A £1.07m N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £19.92k N/A £51.10k N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £82.12k N/A £224.72k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £1.62k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £12.44k N/A £13.05k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £69.67k N/A £209.46k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £1.62k N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £14.07k N/A